Regulated Clinic Inspections Detail

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

<<Back to Listing

Uptown Eye Specialists

Current Business Address:
2180 Steeles Avenue West
Suite 221
Concord Ontario L4K 2Z5

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Apr 07, 2016 Pass View PDF
Feb 29, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Apr 27, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jan 07, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 10, 2014 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Apr 09, 2012 Pass View PDF

Need Assistance?


Call the Public & Physician Advisory Service, weekdays from 8 a.m. to 5 p.m., 416-967-2603  or  1-800-268-7096 ext 603

Email us

 

Get Adobe Reader

You must have Adobe Reader installed in order to view PDF documents.