Regulated Clinic Inspections Detail

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

<<Back to Listing

The Reimer Clinic - Ottawa

Current Business Address:
1280 Old Innes Road
Unit 802-803
Ottawa Ontario K1B 5M7

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jun 28, 2016 Pass View PDF
Apr 19, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Dec 18, 2015 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Aug 13, 2013 Pass View PDF
Jun 10, 2013 Pass with Conditions View PDF

Need Assistance?


Call the Public & Physician Advisory Service, weekdays from 8 a.m. to 5 p.m., 416-967-2603  or  1-800-268-7096 ext 603

Email us

 

Get Adobe Reader

You must have Adobe Reader installed in order to view PDF documents.