Regulated Clinic Inspections Detail

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

<<Back to Listing

The Advanced Medical Therapeutics

Current Business Address:
20 De Boers Drive
Suite 207
Toronto Ontario M3J 0H1

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jul 04, 2017 Withdrawal
Jun 05, 2017 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Apr 06, 2016 Pass View PDF
Dec 02, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jun 23, 2015 Pass View PDF
Apr 27, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jan 06, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Oct 29, 2014 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Nov 23, 2012 Pass View PDF

Need Assistance?


Call the Public & Physician Advisory Service, weekdays from 8 a.m. to 5 p.m., 416-967-2603  or  1-800-268-7096 ext 603

Email us

 

Get Adobe Reader

You must have Adobe Reader installed in order to view PDF documents.