What's New

2018 - 04 - 26 Discipline Committee Decisions Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. Michal Edmund Mrozek; Dr. Farooq Ali Khan; Dr. Paul King Shuen; Dr. Mohan Krishnan Raja; Dr. George Williams Otto; Dr. Richard Kok Tiong Chan
April 26, 2018

2018 - 03 - 28 Discipline Committee Decisions Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. Cathy Sheila Frank; Dr. Naseeruddin Syed; Dr. Abida Sophina Jamal; Dr. Melvyn Lawrence Iscove; Dr. Ian Kent Shiozaki; Dr. Michael Kaminski; Dr. Wagdy Abdalla Botros; Dr. Robert Stewart Cameron
March 28, 2018

2018 - 02 - 28 Discipline Committee Decisions Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. Christopher Stephen Doyle; Dr. Albert Poh Soon Choong; Dr. Christian Andrew Proulx; Dr. Adel Abduselam Abdurahman; Dr. Mathieu Bélanger; Dr. Leslie Curtis Wright; Dr. Rodion Andrew Kunynetz; Dr. Javad Peirovy
February 28, 2018

Dr. Nancy Whitmore to Join CPSO as Registrar/CEO
February 13, 2018

CPSO’s Effective Referral Requirement Affirmed by Superior Court
January 31, 2018

2018 - 01 - 29 Discipline Committee Decisions Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. Jamal Ali Mohamed H. Rakem; Dr. Atul Kesarwani; Dr. John Lee Bingham; Dr. John Leslie Dimock; Dr. Ashraf Fekry Zaki Mourcos; Dr. Emad Samir Luka Guirguis; Dr. Yelian Garcia; Dr. Jeremy Keith Alken Roberts
January 29, 2018

2017 - 12 - 20 Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. Anthony Michael Galea; Dr. Ranjit Kumar Chandra; Dr. Peter Bernard Cote; Dr. Kelvin Wing-Ming Leung; Dr. Chee Choon Lee; Dr. Mohammed Abdullah H Al Abdulmohsin
December 20, 2017

Dr. Kenneth Fung: Advocate for culturally sensitive mental health
November 30, 2017

2017 - 11 - 29 Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. Martin M.S. Lee; Dr. Kaveri Manian Kaveri Selvan; Dr. Mory Mayer Gutman; Dr. Thomas Richard Mayberry; Dr. Tsai Hsing Yu; Dr. Mohan Krishnan Raja
November 29, 2017

2017 - 10 - 30 Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. William Arthur Damian Beairsto; Dr. Mohammed Abdullah H Al Abdulmohsin; Dr. Israel Shoel Rosenhek; Dr. Wycliffe Hobart Baird
October 30, 2017

2017 - 10 - 4 Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. Mory Mayer Gutman; Dr. Rob Joseph Kamermans; Dr. Rasiklal Narshidas Morzaria
October 4, 2017

CPSO Releases Interim Opioid Strategy Progress Update
September 7, 2017

Dr. Michael Stephenson, Kitchener champion of refugee health, receives CPSO Council Award
September 7, 2017

2017 - 8 - 30 Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. Roger Cyril Wales; Dr. Allyson Enid Koffman; Dr. Nagi Nazmi Riad Ghabbour
August 30, 2017

2017 - 7 - 31 Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. Daniel Robert Marshall; Dr. Daniel Charles Sweet; Dr. Ejaz Ahmed Ghumman
July 31, 2017

2017 - 6 - 29 Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. Peter Paul Baranick; Dr. Robert Claude Maranda; Dr. James Wen Young; Dr. Reza Yaghini; Dr. Kulbir Singh Billing
June 29, 2017

CPSO defends patients’ rights to access health services
June 13, 2017

2017 - 5 - 29 Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. Arturo Sanchez; Dr. Jeffrey Rice Holmes Matheson; Dr. Jamal Ali Mohamed Rakem; Dr. Kenneth Werezak Adams; Dr. David James Hill
May 29, 2017

Dr. William Gary Smith of Orillia receives CPSO Council Award
May 23, 2017

College Welcomes 2017 Canadian Guideline for Opioids for Chronic Pain
May 8, 2017

2017 - 5 - 1 Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. Reza Yaghini; Dr. Haya Maal-Bared; Dr. Patrick Wing Nin Yau; Dr. Yelian Garcia; Dr. Joseph Antonio Zadra; Dr. Andrew Winston Taylor
May 1, 2017

Registrar Dr. Rocco Gerace Stepping Down
April 3, 2017

2017 - 4 - 3 Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. Bijan Pardis; Dr. Susan Louise Roche; Dr. Peter Michael Fenton; Dr. Mehdi Horri
April 3, 2017

CPSO begins legal proceeding against person practising medicine without a licence
April 3, 2017

2017 - 3 - 3 Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. Reza Yaghini; Dr. Thomas Joseph Barnard; Dr. Timothy Gordon Remillard
March 3, 2017

Dr. Shazia Ambreen of Alliston receives Council Award 
February 21, 2017

2017 - 1 - 31 Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. Gerard Michael MacNeil; Dr. Reza Yaghini; Dr. Gerald Wayne Powell; Dr. Martin M.S. Lee; Dr. Marc Jeffrey Podell
January 31, 2017

2016 - 12 - 21 Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. Wing-Tai Fung; Dr. James Wen Young; Dr. David James Hill; Dr. Ravi Kakar; Dr. Christopher Pinto
December 21, 2016

Protecting Patients from Sexual Abuse 
December 8, 2016

2016 - 11 - 28 Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. Jan Pieter Lucas; Dr. Francesca Anne Di Paola; Dr. Barbara Anne Pilarski; Dr. Kevin Johnston; Dr. Romulo Fanio Anastasio Jr.; Dr. Paramjit Gill; Dr. Somchai Jiaravuthisan; Dr. Murray Bruce Wilson; Dr. Kulbir Singh Billing
November 28, 2016

Ensuring Safe Opioid Prescribing: Statement from CPSO president, Dr. Joel Kirsh
November 3, 2016

2016 - 10 - 27 Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. Janice Louise Ruggles; Dr. Rajinder Singh Sekhon; Dr. Donato Anthony Ruggiero; Dr. Robert Samuel Crozier; Dr. Christopher Paul Brand; Dr. Anthony Michael Galea
October 27, 2016

2016 - 9 - 29 Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. Jacques Henri Dubins; Dr. Daniel Robert Marshall; Dr. Zvi Margaliot; Dr. Mirza Rajabali Virani; Dr. Wagdy Abdalla Botros; Dr. Mehdi Horri; Dr. Paul Michael Porter
September 29, 2016

CPSO Leads the Way for Greater Public Protection
September 9, 2016

2016 - 8 - 31 Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. Julie Lee Clowater; Dr. Rob Joseph Kamermans; Dr. Ali Ali Abdulla Mansour; Dr. Andrew Winston Taylor; Dr. William Arthur Damian Beairsto; Dr. Medhat Nader Ramzy; Dr. Ira Michael Price; Dr. Donato Anthony Ruggiero
August 31, 2016

2016 - 7 - 25 Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. Douglas Earl Brooks; Dr. Judi Dianne Marcin; Dr. Anthony Richard Eldon Laws; Dr. Clary Jefferson Foote
July 25, 2016

2016 - 6 - 27 Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. Pavel Frantisek Straka; Dr. Mirza Rajabali Virani
June 27, 2016

College provides guidance on physician-assisted death
June 6, 2016

2016 - 5 - 26 Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. Sherapartap Singh Rai; Dr. Swaran Kaur Syan; Dr. William Maclaren Muirhead; Dr. Julie Lee Clowater; Dr. Atef Malak Shehata Ghali
May 26, 2016

College recommends amendments to legislation to facilitate and clarify patient access to medical assistance in dying
May 10, 2016

2016 - 4 - 29 Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. Judi Dianne Marcin; Dr. Jayant Shankerprasad Bhatt; Dr. Howard Sheldon Einstoss; Dr. Javad Peirovy; Dr. Creighton Hui
April 29, 2016

Federal legislation on medical assistance in dying
April 14, 2016

2016 - 3 - 30 Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. Wagdy Abdalla Botros; Dr. George Glumac; Dr. Daniel Marshall
March 30, 2016

2016 - 2 - 29 Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. Chinniah Krishnalingam; Dr. Paul Michael Porter; Dr. Anna Maria Wojcicka; Dr. Andrzej Tomasz Wojcicki; Dr. Wagdy Abdalla Botros; Dr. Herman Yip-Chi Ng
February 29, 2016

2016 - 1 - 29 Discipline Committee Decisions: Dr. John Edward Esmond; Dr. Sherapartap Singh Rai
January 29, 2016

Physician-Assisted Death: College Approves Interim Guidance
January 26, 2016

Our Statement to The Fifth Estate
January 21, 2016

Discipline Committee Decisions

Photo of a gavel on top of law booksComplete Discipline Committee decisions are posted on our website as they become available. Look up the doctor’s name in Find a Doctor for further information.