Discipline Committee Decision

Discipline Committee Decision

Dr. Dariusz Piotr Piatek; Dr. Alvin Wah Wing Lau

Dec 20, 2013

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) released the results of its most recent disciplinary hearings.  The College is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario.  Hearings are held to review allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence, and are open to the public.  The following are brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results.  The Discipline Committee’s full decisions and reasons for decisions are posted on the College’s website as they become available. 

Full decisions are located by entering the doctor’s name in the All Doctors Search section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca.

Dr. Dariusz Piotr Piatek, Mississauga.  On November 27, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Piatek committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise, and he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. Dr. Piatek admitted the allegations.

On December 19, 2011, Dr. Piatek plead guilty to, and was convicted of, the following charge: that he did, in the city of Mississauga, between January 1, 2008 and July 30, 2009, submit billings to the Ontario Health Insurance Plan that did not comply with the requirements of the Schedule of Benefits and did thereby commit an offense contrary to the Health Insurance Act, Section 44(1)(a). Dr. Piatek has been found guilty of professional misconduct by the CPSO's Discipline Committee on one prior occasion. On August 12, 2008, he admitted to having been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise by willfully evading the payment of income taxes. Dr. Piatek is currently subject to terms, conditions and limitations imposed by Order of the Fitness to Practise Committee of the College.

The Discipline Committee ordered a public reprimand and directed that Dr. Piatek pay the College costs in the amount of $4,460. 

Dr. Alvin Wah Wing Lau, Toronto.  On December 2, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Lau, a family physician, committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

On August 21, 2007, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Lau had failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, in that he failed to conduct a physical examination of four obstetrical patients and did not take a history of three of those patients, but noted on the patient record that he had done so. 

The Discipline Committee ordered, among other things, that Dr. Lau's certificate of registration be suspended for 12 months (four months of which suspension would itself be suspended if Dr. Lau completed College-approved courses in Ethics and Communications Skills) and that terms, conditions and limitations be placed upon Dr. Lau's certificate of registration.

Dr. Lau admits that he did not seek guidance or advice from the College regarding compliance with the 2007 Order of the Discipline Committee where a patient requested that the monitor not be present; and he did not apply to vary the terms of the Order of the Discipline Committee to address situations where a patient requested that the monitor not be present.

Dr. Lau admits that he failed to comply with the terms, conditions and limitations imposed by the Discipline Committee on his certificate of registration on August 21, 2007, in that he permitted the monitor to be absent from the room in response to specific patient requests.

The Committee reserved its decision on penalty.