News Release

2015 - 10 - 29 - Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. George Williams Otto; Dr. Bertram Wing King; Dr. Tariq Iqbal

Oct 29, 2015

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public. The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the Public Register – All Doctors Search section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca and click on “view details”, or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Dr. George Williams Otto, Toronto. On October 5, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Otto committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession; and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. Dr. Otto admitted to the allegations.

A detailed summary of the decision and the penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Otto’s profile.

Dr. Bertram Wing King, Toronto. On October 14, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Wing King committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. Dr. Wing King did not contest the allegation.

A detailed summary of the decision and the penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Wing King’s profile.

Dr. Tariq Iqbal, Brockville. On September 24, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Iqbal committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in sexual abuse in respect of four patients; he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct; and he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Dr. Iqbal had denied the allegations.

A detailed summary of the decision and the penalty ordered on October 20, 2015, is available on the public register at Dr. Iqbal’s profile.