News Release

2015 - 12 - 17 - Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Michael Varenbut; Dr. Stanley Thomas Dobrowolski; Dr. Stephen Rose James; Dr. Wagdy Abdalla Botros

Dec 17, 2015

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public. The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the Public Register – All Doctors Search section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca and click on “view details”, or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Dr. Michael Varenbut, Richmond Hill.  On November 20, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Varenbut committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. Dr. Varenbut admitted that he engaged in professional misconduct by failing to provide complete and/or accurate information in a timely manner to the University and/or hospitals where he had an academic appointment and/or from whom he sought reappointment.

A detailed summary of the decision and the penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Varenbut’s profile.

Dr. Stanley Thomas Dobrowolski (no practice address).  On November 30, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Dobrowolski committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in the sexual abuse of patients; he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct; he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession; and he has been found guilty of offences relevant to his suitability to practise. Dr. Dobrowolski did not contest the allegations.

A detailed summary of the decision and the penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Dobrowolski’s profile.

Dr. Stephen Rose James, Toronto.  On November 16, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. James committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, and he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. The Committee also found Dr. James is incompetent. Specifically, the findings of professional misconduct relate to his care and treatment, including his infection control practices, of: Patients A to F as well as the additional seven (Patients T to Z) identified by Toronto Public Health.

A detailed summary of the decision and the penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee on December 15, 2015, is available on the public register at Dr. James’ profile.

Dr. Wagdy Abdalla Botros, Kitchener. On July 31, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Botros is incompetent, and that he committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care and treatment of 22 patients in his sleep medicine practice between 2007 and 2010, and he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. Dr. Botros had denied the allegations.

On December 16, 2015, the Discipline Committee released its decision on penalty, which is available on the public register at Dr. Botros’ profile.