News Release

2015 - 4 - 30 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. John Hyunsik Shin; Dr. Diane Elizabeth Egles; Dr. Gregory John Jun Tung Lowe; Dr. Swaran Kaur Syan; Dr. Wagdy Abdalla Botros

Apr 30, 2015

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) released the results of its most recent disciplinary hearings.  The College is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Hearings are held to review allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence, and are open to the public. The following are brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. The Discipline Committee’s full decisions and reasons for decisions are posted on the College’s website as they become available.  To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the Doctor Search section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca and click on “view details”, or use the link to each doctor’s profile on Doctor Search, provided below.

Dr. John Hyunsik Shin, Toronto.  On April 1, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Shin committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise; and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.  Dr. Shin admitted to the allegations.

A detailed summary of the decision and the penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Shin’s profile.

Dr. Diane Elizabeth Egles, Southampton.  On April 7, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Egles committed an act of professional misconduct, in that she has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.  Dr. Egles admitted to the allegation.

A detailed summary of the decision and the penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Egles’ profile.

Dr. Gregory John Jun Tung Lowe, Toronto.  On April 8, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Lowe committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.  Dr. Lowe admitted to the allegation.

A detailed summary of the decision and the penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Lowe’s profile.

Dr. Swaran Kaur Syan, Sudbury.  On April 14, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Syan committed an act of professional misconduct, in that she failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in respect of her care and treatment of 20 patients.  Dr. Syan admitted to the allegation.

A detailed summary of the decision and the penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Syan’s profile.

Dr. Wagdy Abdalla Botros, Kitchener.  On April 21, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Botros committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. Dr. Botros had denied the allegation. The Discipline Committee has directed that a date be scheduled for a penalty hearing.

A detailed summary of the decision of the Discipline Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Botros’ profile.