News Release

2015 - 5 - 27 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Sammy Joe Sliwin; Dr. Sharif Tadros; Dr. Ramesh Patel; Dr. Peter John Brown

May 27, 2015

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) released the results of its most recent disciplinary hearings. The College is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Hearings are held to review allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence, and are open to the public. The following are brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. The Discipline Committee’s full decisions and reasons for decisions are posted on the College’s website as they become available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the Public Register – All Doctors Search section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca and click on “view details”, or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Dr. Sammy Joe Sliwin, Toronto. On September 11, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Sliwin committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient, and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. Following a contested penalty hearing, at which the Discipline Committee heard a constitutional motion brought by Dr. Sliwin, the Committee released its penalty decision on April 1, 2015.

On April 2, 2015, Dr. Sliwin appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court), and made a motion to the Divisional Court to stay the order of the Discipline Committee pending the appeal. On April 8, 2015, the Divisional Court ordered that Dr. Sliwin's revocation be stayed and that he be permitted to practise pending the appeal.

A detailed summary of the decision and the penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Sliwin’s profile.

Dr. Sharif Tadros, (no practice address). On May 6, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Tadros committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of patients; he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct; and he contravened a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration. Dr. Tadros admitted to the allegations.

A detailed summary of the decision and the penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Tadros’ profile.

Dr. Ramesh Patel, Scarborough. On March 9, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Patel is incompetent and committed an act of professional misconduct by failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of 25 patients and by engaging in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, namely: inadequate supervision of staff; improper delegation of controlled acts; improperly permitting and/or directing staff to prescribe to patients; inappropriately having staff care for and treat patients in his absence; inappropriate billing to OHIP; and breaching his undertaking to the College. Dr. Patel admitted to the allegations.

In addition, Dr. Patel pleaded no contest to and the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Patel committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct regarding his care of Patients A and B.

A detailed summary of the decision and the penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee on May 20, 2015, is available on the public register at Dr. Patel’s profile.

Dr. Peter John Brown, London. On May 20, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Brown committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient, and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. Dr. Brown admitted to the allegation of disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. The Discipline Committee has directed that a date be scheduled for a penalty hearing.

A detailed summary of the decision of the Discipline Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Brown’s profile.