News Release

2015 - 8 - 27 - Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Wagdy Abdalla Botros; Dr. Peter John Brown; Dr. Wayne Edgar Stanley

Aug 27, 2015

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario.  Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public.  The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results.  A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available.  To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the Public Register – All Doctors Search section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca and click on “view details”, or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Dr. Wagdy Abdalla Botros, Kitchener. On July 31, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Botros is incompetent, and that he committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. Dr. Botros had denied the allegations.

A penalty hearing is yet to be scheduled.

A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and incompetence is available on the public register at Dr. Botros’ profile.

Dr. Peter John Brown, London. On May 20, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Brown committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he sexually abused a patient, and he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. Dr. Brown admitted to the allegation of disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

On August 17, 2015, the penalty hearing was held. A detailed summary of the decision of the Discipline Committee and the penalty ordered is available on the public register at Dr. Brown’s profile.

Dr. Wayne Edgar Stanley, Lindsay. On August 21, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Stanley committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he sexually abused patients, and he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. Dr. Stanley did not contest the allegations.

A detailed summary of the decision and the penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Stanley’s profile.