News Release

2016 - 10 - 27 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Janice Louise Ruggles; Dr. Rajinder Singh Sekhon; Dr. Donato Anthony Ruggiero; Dr. Robert Samuel Crozier; Dr. Christopher Paul Brand; Dr. Anthony Michael Galea

Oct 27, 2016

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public. The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the Public Register – All Doctors Search section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca and click on “view details”, or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Dr. Janice Louise Ruggles, Pickering
On October 5, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Ruggles has committed acts of professional misconduct, in that she has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct, and she has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Ruggles’ profile.

Dr. Rajinder Singh Sekhon, formerly Windsor, Ajax (no practice address)
On October 12, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Sekhon committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in the sexual abuse of patients; he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession; and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. The Discipline Committee also found that Dr. Sekhon is incompetent.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and incompetence, and the penalty ordered by the Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Sekhon’s profile.

Dr. Donato Anthony Ruggiero, formerly Toronto (no practice address)
On August 23, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Ruggiero committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in sexual impropriety in respect of a patient during a medical appointment in his office in approximately 1986.

A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Committee on October 14, 2016, is available at Dr. Ruggiero’s profile.

Dr. Robert Samuel Crozier, formerly London (no practice address)
On October 17, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Crozier committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of patients; engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct; and has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Crozier’s profile.

Dr. Christopher Paul Brand, Brechin
On October 18, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Brand committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct.

A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Committee is available at Dr. Brand’s profile.

Dr. Anthony Michael Galea, Toronto
On October 24, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Galea committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practise; and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct.

A penalty hearing is yet to be scheduled.

A detailed summary on the finding of professional misconduct is available on Dr. Galea’s profile.