News Release

2016 - 2 - 29 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Chinniah Krishnalingam; Dr. Paul Michael Porter; Dr. Anna Maria Wojcicka; Dr. Andrzej Tomasz Wojcicki; Dr. Wagdy Abdalla Botros; Dr. Herman Yip-Chi Ng

Feb 29, 2016

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public. The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the Public Register – All Doctors Search section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca and click on “view details”, or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Dr. Chinniah Krishnalingam, (no practice address).  On February 8, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Krishnalingam committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has sexually abused a patient; and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. Dr. Krishnalingam did not contest the allegations.

A detailed summary of the findings of professional misconduct and penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Krishnalingam’s profile.

Dr. Paul Michael Porter, St. Catharines.  On February 11, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Porter committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has sexually abused Patient A; and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

A penalty hearing is yet to be scheduled.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct is available on the public register at Dr. Porter’s profile.

Dr. Anna Maria Wojcicka, Mount Albert.  On February 17, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Wojcicka committed an act of professional misconduct, in that she has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in relation to her Bioidentical Hormone Replacement Therapy practice.

A detailed summary of the findings of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Wojcicka’s profile.

Dr. Andrzej Tomasz Wojcicki, Mount Albert.  On February 22, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Wojcicki committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession; and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. The Discipline Committee also found that Dr. Wojcicki is incompetent. 

A detailed summary of the findings of professional misconduct and penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Wojcicki’s profile.

Dr. Wagdy Abdalla Botros, Kitchener.  On April 21, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Botros committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by failing to comply with the March 2011 Order of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee requiring him to complete a specified continuing education or remediation program in communications.

A detailed summary of the decision and the penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee on February 22, 2016 is available on the public register at Dr. Botros’ profile.

Dr. Herman Yip-Chi Ng, (no practice address).  On February 22, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Ng committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession; and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. The Discipline Committee also found that Dr. Ng is incompetent.

A detailed summary of the findings of professional misconduct and penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Ng’s profile.