News Release

2016 - 4 - 29 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Judi Dianne Marcin; Dr. Jayant Shankerprasad Bhatt; Dr. Howard Sheldon Einstoss; Dr. Javad Peirovy; Dr. Creighton Hui

Apr 29, 2016

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario.  Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public.  The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results.  A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available.  To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the Public Register — All Doctors Search section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca and click on “view details”, or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Dr. Judi Dianne Marcin, Woodstock.  On March 30, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Marcin is incompetent and committed acts of professional misconduct, in that she has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to her suitability to practise; she has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct; she failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession; she contravened terms, conditions, or limitations on her certificate of registration; and she has engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician. 

A penalty hearing is yet to be scheduled.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of incompetence and professional misconduct is available on the public register at Dr. Marcin’s profile.

Dr. Jayant Shankerprasad Bhatt, Brockville.  On April 4, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Bhatt committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

A detailed summary of the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Bhatt’s profile.

Dr. Howard Sheldon Einstoss (no practice address).  On April 12, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Einstoss committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of patients, and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. 

A detailed summary of the findings of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Einstoss’ profile.

Dr. Javad Peirovy, Toronto.  On July 17, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Peirovy committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of patients; he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct; and he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise.

A detailed summary of the findings of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee on April 27, 2016 is available on the public register at Dr. Peirovy’s profile.

Dr. Creighton Hui, Newmarket.  On April 28, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Hui committed an act of professional misconduct, in that the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario has found that Dr. Hui committed an act of professional misconduct that would, in the opinion of the Committee, be an act of professional misconduct as defined under Ontario legislation.

A detailed summary of the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Hui’s profile.