News Release

2016 - 9 - 29 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Jacques Henri Dubins; Dr. Daniel Robert Marshall; Dr. Zvi Margaliot; Dr. Mirza Rajabali Virani; Dr. Wagdy Abdalla Botros; Dr. Mehdi Horri; Dr. Paul Michael Porter

Sep 29, 2016

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario.  Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public.  The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results.  A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available.  To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the Public Register – All Doctors Search section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca and click on “view details”, or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Dr. Jacques Henri Dubins, Toronto (no practice address)
On August 29, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Dubins committed acts of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Dubins’ profile.

Dr. Daniel Robert Marshall, Hamilton (no practice address)
On March 28, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Marshall committed acts of professional misconduct in that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and had been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise. On September 16, 2016, the Committee released its decision on penalty.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Marshall’s profile.

Dr. Zvi Margaliot, Mississauga (no practice address)
On September 19, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Margaliot committed acts of professional misconduct in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Committee is available on Dr. Margaliot’s profile.

Dr. Mirza Rajabali Virani, Markham
On June 20, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Virani committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. On September 21, 2016, the Committee released its decision on penalty.

A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Virani’s profile.

Dr. Wagdy Abdalla Botros, Kitchener (no practice address)
On March 7, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Botros committed acts of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. On September 23, 2016, the Committee released its decision on penalty.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Committee is available at Dr. Botros’ profile.

Dr. Mehdi Horri, Saskatchewan
On September 26, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Horri committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by engaging in a sexual relationship with a patient too soon after the termination of the doctor-patient relationship.  The penalty hearing continues on October 13, 2016.

A detailed summary on the finding of professional misconduct is available on Dr. Horri’s profile.

Dr. Paul Michael Porter, St. Catherines (no practice address)
On February 11, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Porter committed acts of professional misconduct in that he engaged in sexual abuse of a patient and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. On September 28, 2016, the Committee released its decision on penalty.

A detailed summary of the findings of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Committee is available at Dr. Porter’s profile.