News Release

2017 - 11 - 29 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Martin M.S. Lee; Dr. Kaveri Manian Kaveri Selvan; Dr. Mory Mayer Gutman; Dr. Thomas Richard Mayberry; Dr. Tsai Hsing Yu; Dr. Mohan Krishnan Raja

Nov 29, 2017

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public. The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the “Public Information & Services – Find a Doctor” section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca to view “Details”, or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Dr. Martin M.S. Lee (no practice address) formerly Mississauga
On January 17, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Lee committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient, and he engaged in disgraceful dishonorable or unprofessional conduct.

A penalty hearing was held on May 2, 2017, and the Committee reserved its decision. On November 2, 2017, the Discipline Committee released its penalty decision. A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and the penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Lee’s profile.

Dr. Kaveri Manian Kaveri Selvan, Brampton
On November 6, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Kaveri Selvan committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct.

A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Kaveri Selvan’s profile.

Dr. Mory Mayer Gutman, Toronto
On August 24, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Gutman committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. The Committee reserved its decision regarding the penalty.

On November 10, 2017, the Discipline Committee released its penalty decision. A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Gutman's profile.

Dr. Thomas Richard Mayberry, Ingersoll
On November 15, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Mayberry committed an act of professional misconduct, in that has engaged in disgraceful, dishonorable, or unprofessional conduct.

A summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Mayberry’s profile.

Dr. Tsai Hsing Yu, St. Catharines
On November 24, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Yu committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct.

A summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Yu’s profile.

Dr. Mohan Krishnan Raja, Paris
On November 27, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Raja committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct.

A penalty hearing is to be scheduled.

A detailed decision on the finding of professional misconduct is available on the public register at Dr. Raja’s profile.