News Release

2017 - 12 - 20 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Anthony Michael Galea; Dr. Ranjit Kumar Chandra; Dr. Peter Bernard Cote; Dr. Kelvin Wing-Ming Leung; Dr. Chee Choon Lee; Dr. Mohammed Abdullah H Al Abdulmohsin

Dec 20, 2017

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public. The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the “Public Information & Services – Find a Doctor” section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Dr. Anthony Michael Galea, Toronto
On October 24, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Galea committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practise; and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct.

A detailed summary of the findings of professional misconduct and penalty ordered on December 6, 2017, is available on the public register at Dr. Galea’s profile.

Dr. Ranjit Kumar Chandra (no practice address) formerly Brampton
On December 8, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Chandra committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to respond appropriately or within a reasonable time to a written inquiry from the College, and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonorable, or unprofessional conduct.

On December 14, 2017, the Committee reserved its penalty decision.

A summary of the findings of professional misconduct is available on the public register at Dr. Chandra’s profile.

Dr. Peter Bernard Cote (no practice address) formerly Manitouwadge
On December 8, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Cote committed an act of professional misconduct, in that has engaged in disgraceful, dishonorable, or unprofessional conduct.

A summary of the findings of professional misconduct and penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Cote’s profile.

Dr. Kelvin Wing-Ming Leung, Toronto
On December 11, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Leung committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession; and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct.

A detailed summary of the findings of professional misconduct and penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Leung’s profile.

Dr. Chee Choon Lee, Scarborough
On December 14, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Lee committed an act of professional misconduct, in that has engaged in disgraceful, dishonorable, or unprofessional conduct.

A penalty hearing is yet to be scheduled.

A detailed summary of the finding of professional misconduct is available on the public register at Dr. Lee’s profile.

Dr. Mohammed Abdullah H Al Abdulmohsin, Brampton
On October 7, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Al Abdulmohsin committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by inappropriately submitting OHIP clinical billings for payment for services he provided during his residency education program for personal gain, despite this not being permitted under the agreement between the Saudi Bureau and Revenue Canada and against the express advice of his Divisional Chief and Program Director. The Committee further found that he engaged in unprofessional conduct by touching two nurses in an intimate and intrusive manner.

A detailed summary of the findings of professional misconduct and penalty ordered on December 18, 2017, is available on the public register at Dr. Al Abdulmohsin’s profile.