News Release

2017 - 4 - 3 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Bijan Pardis; Dr. Susan Louise Roche; Dr. Peter Michael Fenton; Dr. Mehdi Horri

Apr 03, 2017

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public. The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the Public Register – All Doctors Search section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca and click on “view details”, or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Dr. Bijan Pardis, Markham
On March 8, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Pardis has committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.

A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct; the undertaking Dr. Pardis made to stop practising family medicine; and the penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Pardis’ profile.

Dr. Susan Louise Roche, Orleans
On March 13, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Roche committed acts of professional misconduct, in that she has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession; and she has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by failing to maintain appropriate boundaries in a number of respects with Patient A; requiring Patient A and other patients to do errands for her; sharing private and confidential information pertaining to Patient A with others in group therapy without her consent; failing to transmit clinical information in a timely way following termination of care; and, in her inappropriate OHIP billing practices regarding Patient A. The Discipline Committee also found Dr. Roche is incompetent.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and incompetence; the undertaking Dr. Roche made to resign and to never apply for reinstatement or for licensure in another jurisdiction; and the penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Roche’s profile.

Dr. Peter Michael Fenton, Toronto
On March 20, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Fenton committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession; and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. The Discipline Committee also found that Dr. Fenton is incompetent.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and incompetence, and the penalty is available at Dr. Fenton’s profile.

Dr. Mehdi Horri, Saskatchewan
On September 26, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Horri committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by engaging in a sexual relationship with a patient too soon after the termination of the doctor-patient relationship. Following a contested penalty hearing, the Committee reserved its decision on October 13, 2016.

On March 24, 2017, the Committee released its penalty decision. A detailed summary on the finding of professional misconduct and penalty is available on Dr. Horri’s profile.