News Release

2017 - 5 - 1 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Reza Yaghini; Dr. Haya Maal-Bared; Dr. Patrick Wing Nin Yau; Dr. Yelian Garcia; Dr. Joseph Antonio Zadra; Dr. Andrew Winston Taylor

May 01, 2017

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public. The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the Public Register – All Doctors Search section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca and click on “view details”, or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Dr. Reza Yaghini, Thornbury and Barrie
On February 13, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Yaghini committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

On April 5, 2017, the Committee released its penalty order. A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Yaghini’s profile.

Dr. Haya Maal-Bared, Toronto
On April 6, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Maal-Bared committed acts of professional misconduct, in that she has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession; and she has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in relation to her failure to maintain appropriate boundaries with her patients.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and the penalty is available at Dr. Maal-Bared’s profile.

Dr. Patrick Wing Nin Yau, Toronto
On April 12, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Yau committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.

A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty is available at Dr. Yau’s profile.

Dr. Yelian Garcia, Richmond Hill
On February 15, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Garcia committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession; and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

The penalty hearing has been scheduled for October 10 and 12, 2017.

A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct is available on the public register at Dr. Garcia’s profile.

Dr. Joseph Antonio Zadra, Barrie
On April 17, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Zadra committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Zadra’s profile.

Dr. Andrew Winston Taylor, Niagara Falls
On July 29, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Taylor committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

On January 5, 2017, a penalty hearing was held and the Committee reserved its decision. On April 24, 2017, the Committee released its decision on penalty. A detailed summary of the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Taylor’s profile. The decision is under appeal.