News Release

2017 - 5 - 29 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Arturo Sanchez; Dr. Jeffrey Rice Holmes Matheson; Dr. Jamal Ali Mohamed Rakem; Dr. Kenneth Werezak Adams; Dr. David James Hill

May 29, 2017

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public. The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the Public Register – All Doctors Search section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca and click on “view details”, or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Dr. Arturo Sanchez, (no practice address) formerly Toronto
On May 1, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Sanchez committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he was found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise.

A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Sanchez’s profile.

Dr. Jeffrey Rice Holmes Matheson, Ajax
On May 1, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Matheson committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and the penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Matheson’s profile.

Dr. Jamal Ali Mohamed Rakem, (no practice address) formerly Wellend
On May 9, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Rakem committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. The Discipline Committee also found that Dr. Rakem is incompetent.

A penalty hearing is yet to be scheduled.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and incompetence is available on the public register at Dr. Rakem’s profile.

Dr. Kenneth Werezak Adams, Toronto and Richmond Hill
On May 15, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Adams committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and the penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Adams’ profile.

Dr. David James Hill, (no practice address) formerly Toronto
On December 2, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Hill has committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct. The Committee also found that Dr. Hill is incompetent. Dr. Hill’s certificate of registration is currently suspended.

On March 9, 2017, the Discipline Committee reserved its decision on penalty. On May 17, 2017, the Discipline Committee released its decision on penalty. A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and incompetence and penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Hill’s profile. Notice of Appeal.