News Release

2017 - 6 - 29 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Peter Paul Baranick; Dr. Robert Claude Maranda; Dr. James Wen Young; Dr. Reza Yaghini; Dr. Kulbir Singh Billing

Jun 29, 2017

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public. The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the Public Register – All Doctors Search section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca and click on “view details”, or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Dr. Peter Paul Baranick, Ottawa
On June 12, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Baranick committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.

A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Baranick’s profile.

Dr. Robert Claude Maranda, Ottawa
On June 15, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Maranda committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct related to interactions with a medical student.

A summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Maranda’s profile.

Dr. James Wen Young, Toronto
On November 29, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. James Wen Young committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Committee reserved its decision on penalty.

A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered on June 19, 2017, is available on the public register at Dr. Young’s profile.

Dr. Reza Yaghini, Barrie and Thornbury
On December 21, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Yaghini committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient and has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct. A penalty hearing was held March 27-29, 2017, and the Committee reserved its decision.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and penalty ordered on June 20, 2017, is available on the public register at Dr. Yaghini’s profile.

On January 19, 2017, Dr. Yaghini appealed the decision on finding of the Discipline Committee to the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court). Pursuant to s.25(1) of the Statutory Powers Procedure Act, the appeal operates as a stay of the decision pending the outcome of the appeal. Therefore, the decision of the Discipline Committee is not in effect.

Dr. Kulbir Singh Billing, Kitchener
On November 21, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Billing committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. A penalty hearing was held on January 16, 2017, and the Committee reserved its decision.

A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered on June 22, 2017, is available on the public register at Dr. Billing’s profile.