News Release

2018 - 01 - 29 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Jamal Ali Mohamed H. Rakem; Dr. Atul Kesarwani; Dr. John Lee Bingham; Dr. John Leslie Dimock; Dr. Ashraf Fekry Zaki Mourcos; Dr. Emad Samir Luka Guirguis; Dr. Yelian Garcia; Dr. Jeremy Keith Alken Roberts

Jan 29, 2018

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public. The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the “Public Information & Services – Find a Doctor” section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Dr. Jamal Ali Mohamed H. Rakem (no practice address), formerly of Wellend
On May 9, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Rakem committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. The Discipline Committee also found that Dr. Rakem is incompetent.

A penalty hearing was held on January 4, 2018. A summary of the findings of professional misconduct and incompetence and the penalty is available on the public register Dr. Rakem’s profile.

Dr. Atul Kesarwani, Toronto
On January 5, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Kesarwani committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

A summary of the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Kesarwani’s profile.

Dr. John Lee Bingham (no practice address), formerly of Toronto
On January 9, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Bingham committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in sexual abuse of a patient, and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

A summary of the findings of professional misconduct and penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Bingham’s profile.

Dr. John Leslie Dimock, Ottawa
On January 10, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Dimock committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct.

A detailed summary of the finding of professional misconduct and penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Dimock’s profile.

Dr. Ashraf Fekry Zaki Mourcos, Kitchener
On January 15, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Mourcos committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

A detailed summary of the finding of professional misconduct and penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Mourcos’ profile.

Dr. Emad Samir Luka Guirguis, Mississauga
On January 18, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Guirguis committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct.

The Committee reserved its penalty decision.

A detailed summary of the finding of professional misconduct is available on the public register at Dr. Guirguis’ profile.

Dr. Yelian Garcia, Richmond Hill
On February 15, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Garcia committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

A detailed summary of the findings of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered on January 24, 2018 is available on the public register at Dr. Garcia’s profile.

Reinstatement Application

Dr. Jeremy Keith Alken Roberts (no practice address)
On November 3, 2010, the Discipline Committee revoked Dr. Roberts’ certificate of registration, after the Committee found that he had committed an act of professional misconduct, in that the governing body of a health profession in another jurisdiction had found that Dr. Roberts committed an act of professional misconduct that would be an act of professional misconduct as defined in Ontario.

The Discipline Committee held a hearing to consider Dr. Roberts’ application for reinstatement on April 3 and June 19, 2017. At the conclusion of the reinstatement hearing, the Committee reserved its decision.

On January 22, 2018, the Committee dismissed Dr. Roberts’ application for reinstatement. The Committee’s reinstatement decision is available at Dr. Roberts’ profile.