News Release

2018 - 02 - 28 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Christopher Stephen Doyle; Dr. Albert Poh Soon Choong; Dr. Christian Andrew Proulx; Dr. Adel Abduselam Abdurahman; Dr. Mathieu Bélanger; Dr. Leslie Curtis Wright; Dr. Rodion Andrew Kunynetz; Dr. Javad Peirovy

Feb 28, 2018

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public. The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the “Public Information & Services – Find a Doctor” section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Dr. Christopher Stephen Doyle (not currently in practice), formerly of Mississauga
On February 1, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Doyle committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, and he has engaged in unprofessional conduct. The Committee also found that Dr. Doyle is incompetent.

The Committee reserved its decision on penalty and costs. A summary of the findings of professional misconduct and incompetence is available on the public register Dr. Doyle’s profile.

Dr. Albert Poh Soon Choong (no practice address), formerly of Toronto
On February 5, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Choong committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

On January 30, 2018, Dr. Choong resigned from the College effective immediately and has undertaken to not apply or re-apply for registration to practise medicine in Ontario or in any other jurisdiction.

A summary of the findings of professional misconduct and the penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Choong’s profile.

Dr. Christian Andrew Proulx (no practice address), formerly of St. Catharines
On February 6, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Proulx committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, and he has engaged in unprofessional conduct. The Committee also found that Dr. Proulx is incompetent.

A summary of the findings of professional misconduct and incompetence and penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Proulx’s profile.

Dr. Adel Abduselam Abdurahman, Sault Ste. Marie
On February 9, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Abdurahman committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct.

The Discipline Committee reserved its decision on penalty. A summary of the finding of professional misconduct is available on the public register Dr. Abdurahman’s profile.

Dr. Mathieu Bélanger, Ottawa
On February 15, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Bélanger has committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

A summary of the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Bélanger’s profile.

Dr. Leslie Curtis Wright, Toronto
On February 21, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Wright committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician.

A summary of the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Wright’s profile.

Dr. Rodion Andrew Kunynetz (no practice address), formerly of Barrie
On March 21, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Kunynetz committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient; he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct; and he has contravened a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration.

A penalty hearing was held on July 11, July 27, August 14 and 15, 2017. At the conclusion of the penalty hearing, the Committee reserved its penalty decision.

A summary of the findings of professional misconduct, and the penalty ordered on February 20, 2018 is available on the public register at Dr. Kunynetz’s profile.

Dr. Javad Peirovy, Toronto
On February 26, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Peirovy committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonorable, or unprofessional conduct.

A penalty hearing is to be scheduled. A summary of the finding of professional misconduct is available on the public register at Dr. Peirovy’s profile.