News Release

2018 - 03 - 28 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Cathy Sheila Frank; Dr. Naseeruddin Syed; Dr. Abida Sophina Jamal; Dr. Melvyn Lawrence Iscove; Dr. Ian Kent Shiozaki; Dr. Michael Kaminski; Dr. Wagdy Abdalla Botros; Dr. Robert Stewart Cameron

Mar 28, 2018

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public. The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the “Public Information & Services – Find a Doctor” section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Dr. Cathy Sheila Frank (no practice address), formerly of London
On February 26, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Cathy Frank has committed an act of
professional misconduct, in that she failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Committee also found that Dr. Frank is incompetent.

A summary of the findings of professional misconduct and incompetence, and penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Frank’s profile.

Dr. Naseeruddin Syed, Peterborough
On March 5, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Naseeruddin Syed has committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession

A summary of the finding of professional misconduct and penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Syed’s profile.

Dr. Abida Sophina Jamal (no practice address), formerly of Toronto
On March 6, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Abida Sophina Jamal has committed acts of professional misconduct, in that she has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct, and conduct unbecoming a physician.

A summary of the findings of professional misconduct and the penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Jamal’s profile.

Dr. Melvyn Lawrence Iscove (no practice address), formerly of Toronto
On March 8, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Melvyn Lawrence Iscove has committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in sexual abuse of patients, and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonorable, or unprofessional conduct.

Given the finding that he engaged in acts of sexual abuse that would result in mandatory revocation at a penalty hearing, the Committee made an immediate interim order suspending Dr. Iscove’s certificate of registration pending the penalty hearing.

A summary of the findings of professional misconduct is available on the public register at Dr. Iscove’s profile.

Dr. Ian Kent Shiozaki (no practice address), formerly of Newboro
On March 12, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Ian Kent Shiozaki has committed acts of professional misconduct in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Committee also found that Dr. Shiozaki is incompetent.

A summary of the findings of professional misconduct and incompetence, and the penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Shiozaki’s profile.

Dr. Michael Kaminski (no practice address), formerly of Toronto
On March 15, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Michael Kaminski committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

A summary of the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Kaminski’s profile.

Dr. Wagdy Abdalla Botros (no practice address), formerly of Kitchener
On March 20, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Wagdy Abdalla Botros has committed an
act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

The committee reserved its decision on penalty. A summary of the finding of professional misconduct is available on the public register at Dr. Botros’ profile.

Dr. Robert Stewart Cameron, Windsor
On March 26, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Robert Stewart Cameron has committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.

On March 9, 2018, Dr. Cameron entered into an undertaking with the College to resign from the College, effective April 30, 2018 and not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

A summary of the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Cameron’s profile.