Council Updates

Latest news from CPSO's meeting of Council

Print page icon
  • March 2021

    Discussion on goals for 2021 and enhancements to the Discipline Committee.

  • December 2020

    Announcement about CPSO oversight of Physician Assistants; changes to Council Elections; no fee increase

    September 2020

    Reduced Fee for Parental Leave; Burnout; Right-Touch Regulation; Policy

    March & May 2020

    Adapting to COVID-19; Policies; Approved Bylaws; New VP; Right-Touch Regulation; Quality Improvement Program

  • December 5-6, 2019

    Hamilton FP New CPSO President; Council Award Recipient: Dr. Michelle Hladunewich.; Registrar/CEO’s Report;  Strategic Plan KPIs; No fee increase; Council Elections; Boundary Violations; Prescribing Drugs; Disclosure of Harm; Preliminary consultations; Check out e-Dialogue!

    September 20, 2019

    Dr. Mark Spiller receives Council Award; Registrar/CEO’s Report; Continuity of Care; Closing a Medical Practice; Policy Redesign Implementation; Effective Referral; CPR Orders; Governance Update; Transparency; Criminal Record Search; Feedback Wanted; By-law Amendments

    May 30-31, 2019

    Teeswater Family Practitioner Honoured; Registrar/CEO’s Report; Strategic Plan; Policy Redesign Implementation – Batch 1; Policies – External consultations; Cayton Report; Patient Partnership; Governance Update; Posting Criminal Charges and Findings of Guilt from Other Jurisdictions – bylaw circulation

    March 1, 2019

    Pediatric Rheumatologist Honoured with Council Award; Registrar/CEO Report; Quality Improvement/Quality Assurance; Logo Update; Registration Policies; Certain Fees to be Removed from By-Law; Increase in Costs Ordered in Discipline Hearings; Open Consultations

  • December 6-7, 2018

    New CPSO President — Dr. Peeter Poldre; New Chief Medical Advisor Announced; Right Touch Regulation; Traditional Land Acknowledgement; CPSO Governance Review; No Membership Fee Increase for 2019; Policy Redesign; MAID – New Federal Regulations; General By-law Amendments

    September 7, 2018

    Council Award Recipient – Dr. Jason Malinowski; New Registrar Identifies Areas of Focus; New Direction for Opioid Strategy; Development of Strategic Plan; CPSO Governance Review; Delegating Statutory Powers; General By-law Amendments; Consultations Underway – Have Your Say

    May 24-25, 2018

    Council Award Presented to Dr. Sarah Reid; Continuity of Care - Draft for Consultation; Bill 87: Psychotherapy Regulation Proposal; Rescindment of Methadone By-Law; Governance Review

    February 23, 2018

    Council Award Presented to Dr. Bill Wong; Policy Consultation on Closing a Medical Practice; College Releases Interim Opioid Investigation Update; Governance Review; Increase in Costs Ordered in Discipline Hearings; Reporting a Change of Scope, Re-entering Practice; Public Health Emergencies; Continuity of Care and Test Results Management Policy Development; Fee Increase Approved

  • November 30 - December 1, 2017

    New College President; Dr. Kenneth Fung receives Council Award; Uninsured Services: Billing and Block Fees Policy Approved; 2018 Budget; Registration Pathways Program Evaluation; Bill 160, Schedule 9 Oversight of Health Facilities and Devices Act, 2017 ; Prescribing Drugs – Preliminary Consultation; Find out how your opioid prescribing compares to your peers

    September 8, 2017

    Council Award winner; interim opioid strategy; new consultations; facilitating public member presidents; new member orientation; four district 10 physicians acclaimed to Council; Annual Report

    May 25-26, 2017

    Dr. Gary Smith Receives Council Award; Opioid Strategy; Preliminary Consultation Underway; Two Policies Updated; Other News

    February 24, 2017

    Dr. Shazia Ambreen Receives Council Award; Have Your Say on Uninsured Services Policy; Bill 87 — The Protecting Patients' Act; Fertility Clinic Oversight; Other News