Consultations

Current Consultations

Feedback Deadline

Physicians and Health EmergenciesNov 25, 2016

The College is currently reviewing the Physicians and Health Emergencies policy, in accordance with our regular policy review cycle. The current policy was developed after the 2003 SARS epidemic and during the 2009 H1N1 pandemic to reaffirm the profession’s commitment to the public and colleagues in times of health emergencies.

We are reviewing the policy to determine how the policy can be improved in order to ensure it reflects current practice issues, embodies the values and duties of medical professionalism, and is consistent with the College’s mandate to protect the public. As part of the review, we are inviting feedback from the profession, the public and other stakeholders on the current policy. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Proposed Regulation Change: College Oversight of Fertility ServicesNov 25, 2016

The College is proposing an amendment to sections of Ontario Regulation 114/94 which deals with the College’s Out-of-Hospital Premises Inspection Program (“the College’s Program”).  The amendment will provide the College with authority to enter and inspect premises where fertility services are performed, regardless of whether anesthesia or sedation is used.

This proposed regulation amendment was prompted by a request from the provincial government that the College implement a quality and inspections framework for the delivery of fertility services across the province. The College believes that bringing facilities that offer fertility services, regardless of anesthesia or sedation, under the College’s Program is an important step in ensuring patient safety is protected.

We are now inviting feedback on our proposed regulation amendment from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations and other health professionals. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Closed Consultations

Feedback Deadline

Continuity of CareAug 12, 2016

The College is in the process of exploring the topic Continuity of Care with the goal of developing a new policy.  As a part of this process we expect to explore a number of issues including, after-hours care, information exchange between healthcare providers, physician availability to other health care professionals, and walk-in clinics.

We are now inviting feedback from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations and other health professionals to help inform our work on this topic. We want to know what continuity of care means to you, what problems presently exist, and how the College can work with you or other healthcare organizations to overcome them. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

General By-law amendments for Register ContentAug 12, 2016

The College is seeking feedback on several proposed amendments to the register provisions in the General By-Law. The proposed amendments fall into two main categories: 1) revisions intended to reflect College practices and 2) corrections and minor language improvements. These amendments do not propose new information; they reflect information that is already being included on the register.

We are now inviting feedback on the proposed draft amendments from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations and other health professionals. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Practice Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to RelocationAug 12, 2016

The College’s Practice Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation policy is currently under review. This policy sets out expectations for physicians with respect to the practice management measures they should take before they stop practising or in situations where they will not be practising for an extended period of time due to retirement, relocation, leave of absence, or as a result of disciplinary action by the College.

We are now inviting feedback on the policy from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations and other health professionals. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Proposed Changes to OHPIP StandardsAug 12, 2016

The College is seeking feedback on proposed amendments to the Out of Hospital Inspection Program (OHPIP) Standards document. The proposed changes would enhance the responsibility and accountability of the Medical Director, and address matters concerning Quality Assurance, Infection Control and Staff Qualifications.

The Out-of-Hospital Premises Inspection Program (OHPIP) supports continuous quality improvement through developing and maintaining standards for the provision of medical care/procedures in Ontario out-of-hospital premises and by inspecting and assessing for safety and quality of care.

We are now inviting feedback on the draft amendments from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations and other health professionals. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Re-entering PracticeAug 12, 2016

The College’s Re-entering Practice policy is currently under review. The current policy sets out expectations for physicians who wish to re-enter practice after a prolonged absence from practice and sets out requirements of physicians in demonstrating their competency in the area of practice they are returning to.

We are now inviting feedback on the policy from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations and other health professionals. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Test Results Management Aug 12, 2016

The College’s Test Results Management policy is currently under review. This policy sets out expectations for physicians regarding the management of all types of test results, including expectations with respect to developing and maintaining an effective system for managing test results and expectations with respect to following up on test results appropriately.

We are now inviting feedback on the policy from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations and other health professionals. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Physician Scope of PracticeJun 2, 2016

The College is holding a consultation on physician scope of practice. We are now soliciting feedback from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations, and other health professionals on the current Changing Scope of Practice policy and also asking for comments about the concept of scope of practice more broadly. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Proposed By-Law Amendment: Posting of Quality Assurance Committee SCERPsFeb 12, 2016

As a result of Phase 2 of our Transparency initiative, when the College requires an Ontario doctor to undergo a Specified Continuing Education or Remediation Program (SCERP), which is generally done in a moderate-to-high risk situation, the SCERP is published on the doctor’s profile on our Public Register. However, this currently applies to SCERPs arising from our Inquiries, Complaints & Reports Committee (ICRC) only. It does not apply to those arising from our Quality Assurance Committee (QAC). As part of our ongoing Transparency initiative, we are proposing that all SCERPs be published on the Public Register, regardless of which College committee they arise from.

We would like to hear your thoughts on the proposed By-Law amendments that would allow us to add QAC SCERPs resulting from a moderate-to-high risk situation to a doctor’s profile on our Public Register. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Physician Behaviour in the Professional EnvironmentFeb 12, 2016

The draft Physician Behaviour in the Professional Environment policy has been approved by Council for external consultation as part of our policy review process. The key provisions and expectations have not changed. Like its predecessor, the draft policy sets out expectations for physician behaviour grounded in the principles of medical professionalism, namely that physicians act in a respectful, courteous, and civil manner toward their patients, colleagues and others involved in the provision of care. The policy also identifies a subset of unprofessional behaviour known as disruptive behaviour.

We are now inviting feedback on the draft policy from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations and other health professionals. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Proposed Fee Increase of $25Feb 12, 2016

The College is seeking feedback on a draft amendment to the Fees and Remuneration By-Law that would see an increase of 1.6% in membership fees. This increase would bring the fee that a physician pays to renew a certificate of registration from $1,570 to $1,595.

Over the past four years (2012-2016) the College has increased the membership fee for an independent practice certificate $65.00 This represents an average of 1.06% over those four years. By comparison, the average inflation rate in Canada has been 1.46% over the last four years.

The modest increases over the four years (for 2015 there was no increase) have been necessary to meet the increasing activity at the College. The costs reflect the expansion of numerous quality improvement programs, particularly peer assessment, the increasing number of incapacity investigations and sheer volume and increasing complexity of College investigations. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

CPSO Interim Guidance on Physician-Assisted DeathJan 13, 2016

The Supreme Court of Canada's decision, Carter v. Canada, lifts the blanket prohibition on physician-assisted death.  The decision legalizes physician-assisted death in circumstances where a competent adult is suffering intolerably from a grievous and irremediable medical condition, and clearly consents to the termination of life. This decision takes effect on February 6, 2016 unless the federal government is granted an extension.

The College has developed the draft CPSO Interim Guidance on Physician-Assisted Death document to provide interim guidance for the profession in the absence of a framework to govern the provision of physician-assisted death in Ontario.

We are now inviting feedback from all interested stakeholders, including the public and members of the medical profession, on the draft CPSO Interim Guidance on Physician-Assisted Death document.  Please Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

In order to ensure that this draft interim guidance document is finalized in advance of February 6, 2016, we are conducting an abridged consultation. Should the federal government be granted an extension, this timeline would be adjusted accordingly

Blood Borne VirusesNov 20, 2015

The draft Blood Borne Viruses policy has been approved by Council for external consultation.  The draft policy sets out expectations with respect to reducing the risk of acquiring or transmitting a blood borne virus (Hepatitis B, Hepatitis C, and Human Immunodeficiency Virus), as well as expectations for physicians if they are exposed to a blood borne virus, and lastly, expectations for physicians if they are infected with a blood borne virus.

We are now inviting feedback on the draft policy from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations and other health professionals. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Rights and Responsibilities: What to Expect During Medical EncountersNov 20, 2015

The College has developed a draft Rights and Responsibilities document for patients to use as a resource.  It contains information regarding: what patients can expect from their physician during medical encounters, what rights they have as a patient, and how the College can help if they have questions or concerns about something their physician said or did.

We are now inviting feedback on the draft document from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, and other health-care professionals. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Block Fees and Uninsured ServicesNov 20, 2015

The College’s Block Fees and Uninsured Services policy is currently under review. This policy sets out expectations for physicians who charge for uninsured services and/or offer a block fee.

We are now inviting feedback on the policy from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations and other health professionals. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Physician Treatment of Self, Family Members, or Others Close to ThemAug 7, 2015

The draft Physician Treatment of Self, Family Members, or Others Close to Them policy has been approved by Council for external consultation. The draft policy sets out expectations for physicians who are considering providing treatment for themselves, family members, or others close to them, and describes the circumstances in which physicians may provide such treatment.

We are now inviting feedback on the draft policy from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations and other health professionals.

Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Ending the Physician-Patient RelationshipAug 7, 2015

The College is currently reviewing the Ending the Physician-Patient Relationship policy, in accordance with our regular policy review cycle. This policy sets out expectations for physicians who end the physician-patient relationship for any reason other than the physician’s retirement, relocation, leave of absence, or as a result of disciplinary action by the College.

We are reviewing the policy to determine how the policy can be improved in order to ensure it reflects current practice issues, embodies the values and duties of medical professionalism, and is consistent with the College’s mandate to protect the public. As part of the review, we are inviting feedback from the profession, the public and other stakeholders on the current policy.

Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Sexual Abuse Principles Aug 7, 2015

This consultation is now closed. The College’s Sexual Abuse Principles received final approval from Council on September 10, 2015, and now officially ground the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario’s Sexual Abuse Initiative. For a brief summary of the consultation process, including an overview of the feedback received and revisions undertaken, click here

Accepting New Patients Aug 7, 2015

The College’s Accepting New Patients policy is currently under review. The policy sets expectations for physicians when accepting new patients into their primary care practices. The policy emphasizes that physicians must accept new patients in a fair and professional manner to ensure equitable access to care.

We are now inviting feedback on the policy from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations and other health professionals.

Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Transparency Project - Phase 2Apr 1, 2015

The College is working together with other health regulators in considering making additional information publicly available about the health-care professionals that we regulate. To that end, Council approved measures to post criminal findings of guilt made against physicians and Health Insurance Act offences, and bail conditions that affect physician practice on the public register. In Phase 2 of this initiative, the College is now proposing amendments to Section 49. (1) Of the General By-Law, which sets out what information about members is included on the public register. The following are the specific elements of Phase 2 that the by-laws propose making public:

  1. Cautions in Person (ICRC outcome)
  2. Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program Orders (ICRC outcome)
  3. Criminal Charges
  4. Licenses in other jurisdictions
  5. Discipline findings in other jurisdictions

We are seeking your input on the draft by-laws. The deadline to provide feedback is April 1, 2015. Read more.

Consent to TreatmentFeb 20, 2015

This consultation is now closed. The College’s Consent to Treatment policy received final approval from Council on May 28, 2015, and is now an official policy of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. For a brief summary of the policy review process, including an overview of the feedback received and revisions undertaken, click here.

Planning for and Providing Quality End-of-Life CareFeb 20, 2015

This consultation is now closed. The College’s Planning for and Providing Quality End-of-Life Care policy received final approval from Council on September 10, 2015, and is now an official policy of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. For a brief summary of the feedback we received during this consultation, visit our consultation review page.

Professional Obligations and Human RightsFeb 20, 2015

The draft Professional Obligations and Human Rights policy has been approved by Council for external consultation. The draft policy sets out physicians’ existing legal obligations under the Ontario Human Rights Code, and the College’s expectation that physicians will respect the fundamental rights of those who seek their medical services. The draft policy also sets out the College’s expectations for physicians who limit the health services they provide due to their personal values and beliefs. To view further information on this consultation, and to provide your feedback click here.

Improving the Quality of CareDec 12, 2014

Cancer Care Ontario and the CPSO have formed a partnership to develop provincial quality management programs for mammography, colonoscopy and pathology. The goal of these programs is to improve quality of care, transparency and accountability to support the delivery of consistent high-quality care across these services in Ontario, regardless of the location or facility type. We are seeking feedback from service providers, health system administrators, patients and the general public on these programs. Your input will be considered as we prepare to submit our final report to the Ministry of Health and Long-Term Care. The deadline for feedback is December 12, 2014. Learn more about this consultation and provide your feedback.

Marijuana for Medical PurposesDec 5, 2014

This consultation is now closed. The College’s Marijuana for Medical Purposes policy received final approval from Council on March 6, 2015, and is now an official policy of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. For a brief summary of the policy review process, including an overview of the feedback received and revisions undertaken, click here.

Proposed Amendments:Clarifying Annual Application for Renewal Process for Postgraduate MembersDec 5, 2014

The College is seeking feedback on draft amendments to the Fees and Remuneration By-Law that, if passed, would provide greater clarity to the College’s annual application for renewal process for postgraduate members. To view further information on this consultation, and to provide your feedback click here.

Proposed Amendments: Fee for Applications to Modify or Remove the Terms, Conditions or Limitations imposed on a Certificate of RegistrationDec 5, 2014

The College is seeking feedback on draft amendments to the Fees and Remuneration By-Law that, if passed, would add a fee for any member who applies to modify the terms, conditions or limitations of his or her restricted certificate of registration imposed by the Registration Committee. To view further information on this consultation, and to provide your feedback click here.

A Proposal to Add Information to the Public Register: Criminal Code and Health Insurance Act Offences, and Certain Bail ConditionsDec 3, 2014

The College is proposing amendments to Section 49.(1) of the General By-Law, which sets out what information about members is included on the public register.

In particular, the College is proposing that the following information about members be included on the public register:

  • Findings of guilt
  • Bail conditions

What do patients need to know about their physicians in order to make informed choices? That is the test that is being applied as the College examines which categories of information should be posted on our public register as part of our ongoing work on Transparency.

To view further information on this consultation, and to provide your feedback click here.

TelemedicineAug 5, 2014

This consultation is now closed. The College’s Telemedicine policy received final approval from Council on December 4, 2014, and is now an official policy of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. For a brief summary of the policy review process, including an overview of the feedback received and revisions undertaken, click here.

Physician Behaviour in the Professional EnvironmentAug 5, 2014

The College is currently reviewing the Physician Behaviour in the Professional Environment policy, in accordance with our regular policy review cycle. This policy sets out expectations for physician behaviour grounded in the principles of medical professionalism, namely that physicians act in a courteous, dignified and civil manner towards their patients, colleagues and others involved in the provision of care.

We are reviewing the policy to determine how the policy can be improved in order to ensure it reflects current practice issues, embodies the values and duties of medical professionalism, and is consistent with the College’s mandate to protect the public. As part of the review, we are inviting feedback from the profession, the public and other stakeholders on the current policy.

To view further information on this consultation, and to provide your feedback click here.

Blood Borne PathogensAug 5, 2014

The College is currently reviewing the Blood Borne Pathogens policy. This policy sets expectations for physician conduct to safeguard the health of both patients and physicians, and to minimize the risk of exposure to blood borne pathogens through the provision of care.

We are reviewing the policy to determine how the policy can be improved in order to ensure it reflects current practice issues, embodies the values and duties of medical professionalism, and is consistent with the College’s mandate to protect the public. As part of the review, we are inviting feedback from the profession, the public and other stakeholders on the current policy.

To view further information on this consultation, and to provide your feedback click here.

Physicians and the Ontario Human Rights Code Aug 5, 2014

The College is currently reviewing the Physicians and the Ontario Human Rights Code policy, in accordance with our regular policy review cycle. This policy sets out physicians’ legal obligations under the Ontario Human Rights Code (the Code) and the College’s expectations that physicians will respect the fundamental rights of those who seek their medical services. It aims to assist the profession in understanding its existing legal and professional obligations, and provide physicians with guidance about how to comply with these obligations in everyday practice.

We are reviewing the policy to determine how the policy can be improved in order to ensure it reflects current practice issues, embodies the values and duties of medical professionalism, and is consistent with the College’s mandate to protect the public. As part of the review, we are inviting feedback from the profession, the public and other stakeholders on the current policy.

To view further information on this consultation, and to provide your feedback click here.

Physicians’ Relationships with Industry: Practice, Education and ResearchMay 14, 2014

This consultation is now closed. The College’s Physicians’ Relationships with Industry: Practice, Education and Research policy received final approval from Council on September 4, 2014, and is now an official policy of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. For a brief summary of the policy review process, including an overview of the feedback received and revisions undertaken, click here.

Independent Health Facilities “Clinical Practice Parameters and Facility Standards for Pulmonary Function Studies”May 5, 2014

In accordance with the College’s regular review cycle, the Independent Health Facilities (IHF) program’s “Clinical Practice Parameters and Facility Standards for Pulmonary Function Studies” have been updated. The document is designed to assist physicians in their clinical decision-making by providing a framework for assessing and treating clinical conditions in Pulmonary Function facilities.

The College is inviting feedback from the profession, the public and other stakeholders on the updated draft IHF Clinical Practice Parameters and Facility Standards for Pulmonary Function Studies, which is an update to the 2008 document.

The consultation deadline is May 5, 2014. Read more and provide your feedback.

Proposed Amendment to Ontario Regulation 114/94Feb 7, 2014

The College is proposing an amendment to a section of Ontario Regulation 114/94 which deals with the College’s Out-of-Hospital Premises Inspection Program (“the College’s Program”).  The amendment involves removing a provision of the regulation that exempts Independent Health Facilities from the College’s Program.

This amendment will not result in the College inspecting all Independent Health Facilities under the OHPIP. Only those clinics that meet the criteria for the College’s Program (performing procedures under specified types of anaesthetic) will be inspected by the College. The College’s existing role in inspecting IHFs will continue.

This amendment was prompted by the provincial government’s decision to move some procedures out of the hospital environment, and into community specialty clinics and to classify the clinics as Independent Health Facilities.  The College believes that bringing these new clinics under the College’s Program is an important step in ensuring patient safety is protected.

We are now inviting feedback on our proposed regulation amendment from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations and other health professionals.

To view further information on this consultation, and to provide your feedback click here.

Medical Marijuana – Preliminary ConsultationFeb 7, 2014

The College is currently reviewing its Medical Marijuana policy.

As part of this review, the College will be considering new federal regulations that will significantly alter the process for accessing dried marijuana for medical purposes. This review will also help to ensure that any updates to the policy reflect current practice issues, embody the values and duties of medical professionalism, and are consistent with the College’s mandate to protect the public.

As part of this review, we are inviting feedback from the profession, the public and other stakeholders on the current policy.

To view further information on this consultation, and to provide your feedback click here.

Proposed Fee Increase of $20Feb 7, 2014

At its December meeting, after reviewing the proposed budget for 2014, Council has proposed a 1.3% increase in membership fees. This increase would bring the fee that a physician pays to renew a certificate of registration from $1,550 to $1,570. The College is seeking feedback on this draft amendment to the Fees and Remuneration By-Law. To view further information on this consultation, and to provide your feedback click here.

Reinstatement Decisions: Transparency Project AmendmentFeb 7, 2014

The College is seeking feedback on a proposed by-law that would add information to the public register regarding applications for reinstatement that are made to the Executive Committee or Council. To view further information on this consultation, and to provide your feedback click here.

Preliminary Consultation: Decision-making for the End of LifeNov 22, 2013

The College is currently reviewing the Decision-making for the End of Life policy, in accordance with our regular policy review cycle. This policy sets out expectations for physicians with respect to providing medically and ethically appropriate care to patients at the end of life; specifically, care that aims to reduce suffering, respects the wishes and needs of patients and their families, and lessens conflict and distress.

We are reviewing the policy to determine how the policy can be improved in order to ensure it reflects current practice issues, embodies the values and duties of medical professionalism, and is consistent with the College’s mandate to protect the public. As part of the review, we are inviting feedback from the profession, the public and other stakeholders on the current policy.

To view further information on this consultation, and to provide your feedback click here.

Preliminary Consultation: Consent to Medical TreatmentNov 22, 2013

The College is currently reviewing the Consent to Medical Treatment policy, in accordance with our regular policy review cycle. This policy sets out expectations for physicians regarding when and how a physician can obtain a patient’s consent to treatment and what constitutes consent.

We are reviewing the policy to determine how the policy can be improved in order to ensure it reflects current practice issues, embodies the values and duties of medical professionalism, and is consistent with the College’s mandate to protect the public. As part of the review, we are inviting feedback from the profession, the public and other stakeholders on the current policy.

To view further information on this consultation, and to provide your feedback click here.

Preliminary Consultation: Treating Self and FamilyNov 22, 2013

The College is currently reviewing the Treating Self and Family Members policy, in accordance with our regular policy review cycle. The policy sets out the restrictions on physicians diagnosing, treating, and prescribing medications for themselves and their family members. The policy also assists physicians in determining whether it is appropriate to provide treatment to a particular individual.

We are reviewing the policy to determine how the policy can be improved in order to ensure it reflects current practice issues, embodies the values and duties of medical professionalism, and is consistent with the College’s mandate to protect the public. As part of the review, we are inviting feedback from the profession, the public and other stakeholders on the current policy.

To view further information on this consultation, and to provide your feedback click here.

Draft Transparency PrinciplesNov 11, 2013

The Advisory Group for Regulatory Excellence (AGRE), a small group of health professional regulators of which we are a part, has developed draft transparency principles to guide regulatory college discussions about making more information publicly available. The CPSO is asking our membership and the general public to provide feedback on these draft transparency principles, which we will then communicate back to the AGRE. Read the full consultation and provide your feedback.

QA Fees BylawNov 11, 2013

The fees bylaw pertaining to the QA program requires updating for three reasons: the fees have not been changed since 2000, there is reference to an assessment program that no longer exists in the amended QA regulation, and there is reference to courses no longer offered by the College. We invite feedback on these updates from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations, and other health professionals. Read the full consultation and provide your feedback here.

Proposed By-Law Amendments: Transparency Project – Phase IJun 14, 2013

The College is seeking feedback on draft amendments to the General By-Law that, if passed, would permit the following physician-specific categories of information to be added to the College’s online public register to enhance transparency. To view further information on this consultation, and to provide your feedback click here.

Joint Preliminary Consultation: Conflict of Interest: Recruitment of Subjects for Research Studies and MD Relations with Drug CompaniesMar 5, 2013

The College’s Conflict of Interest: Recruitment of Subjects for Research Studies and MD Relations with Drug Companies policies are currently under review.

These two policies have similar themes relating to professionalism, conflict of interest and acting in the best interest of patients. As part of the review process, the College will be considering consolidating these two polices into a single document. The College is inviting feedback from the profession, the public and other stakeholders on these two policies.

To view further information on this consultation, and to provide your feedback click here.

Preliminary Consultation: Confidentiality of Personal Health InformationMar 5, 2013

The College’s Confidentiality of Personal Health Information policy is currently under review in accordance with the regular policy review cycle. The policy sets expectations for physicians with respect to maintaining the confidentiality of their patients’ personal health information and outlines several circumstances where disclosure of confidential personal health information without the patient’s consent may be permissible or required by law.

The main objective of the policy review is to determine how the policy can be improved in order to ensure it reflects current practice issues, embodies the values and duties of medical professionalism, and is consistent with the College’s mandate to protect the public. The College is inviting feedback from the profession, the public and other stakeholders on the current policy.

To view further information on this consultation, and to provide your feedback click here.

Preliminary Consultation: TelemedicineFeb 22, 2013

The College’s Telemedicine policy is currently under review in accordance with the regular policy review cycle. The policy sets expectations for physicians using telecommunications technologies to create audio/visual linkages with patients in different locations, in actual or stored time.

The main objective of the policy review is to determine how the policy can be improved in order to ensure it reflects current practice issues, embodies the values and duties of medical professionalism, and is consistent with the College’s mandate to protect the public. The College is inviting feedback from the profession, the public and other stakeholders on the current policy.

To view further information on this consultation, and to provide your feedback click here.

Releasing Out-of-Hospital Premises Outcomes and Status: Draft By-lawJan 25, 2013

On December 20, 2012, the College held a special meeting of Council to approve the circulation of a proposed by-law permitting us to post the results of our Out-of-Hospital Premises Inspection Program (OHPIP) on the College website. The program, established in 2010, inspected more than 250 premises in Ontario and graded each using the following scale: pass, pass with conditions, or fail.

This by-law, if passed, would increase the transparency of this program by posting the outcomes or status of inspections that have been carried out since April 2010. In particular, this applies to only the most current outcome or status as of when the by-law comes into effect (in or around January 31, 2013) and every outcome or status thereafter.

The College is seeking feedback from both its membership and the public at large on this proposed by-law. To view further information on this consultation, and to provide your feedback click here.