Submissions by CPSO to Government

Medical Marihuana Regulatory Reform

Submission to:

Bureau of Medical Marihuana Regulatory Reform
Controlled Substances and Tobacco Directorate
Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch
Health Canada

February 28, 2013

Response to Consultation on the Proposed Marihuana for Medical Purposes Regulations as per the Canada Gazette, Vol 146, No. 50 - December 15, 2012

Treatment of Spouses – Submission on Bill 70

October 2, 2013: Presentation to the Standing Committee on the Legislative Assembly re: Bill 70, the Regulated Health Professions Amendment Act (Spousal Exception)

Treatment of Spouses – Submission to the Minister of Health

August 14, 2012: The College responds to HPRAC’s recommendation on the treatment of spouses and the sexual abuse provisions of the Regulated Health Professions Act

HPRAC Consultation – Treatment of Spouse

Submission to the Health Professions Regulatory Advisory Council (HPRAC) on the issue of the mandatory revocation provisions and the treatment of spouses by health care professionals under the Regulated Health Professions Act. Available here

Fair Registration Practices Report 2011

Submitted to the Fairness Commissioner on Monday, February 27, 2012. View report.

Submission on Bill 101: the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010

On October 18, 2010, the CPSO made a presentation to the Social Policy Committee on Bill 101, the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act. View presentation

Submissions on Bill 175: the Ontario Labour Mobility Act, 2009

On December 3, 2009, the CPSO made a presentation to the Standing Committee on Justice Policy on Bill 175, the Ontario Labour Mobility Act, which implements the labour mobility provisions in Chapter 7 of the Agreement on Internal Trade (AIT).

Presentation and a summary of recommended amendments
Letter to government regarding application for legitimate objectives exception

On May 26, 2009, the CPSO made a submission to the Provincial Government on the Agreement on Internal Trade in which a Proposal for Exception to Labour Mobility was made. View here

Submissions on Bill 179: The Regulated Health Professions Statute Law Amendment Act, 2009

On September 29, 2009, the CPSO made a presentation to the Standing Committee on Social Policy on Bill 179. View here

In addition to the CPSO’s submission on Bill 179, above, the CPSO made a joint submission on Bill 179 with the Ontario College of Pharmacists, the Royal College of Dental Surgeons, and the College of Nurses of Ontario. View here

Bill 115: Presentation to Justice Policy Committee

On March 12, 2009, College President Dr. Rayudu Koka made a presentation to the Justice Policy Committee in relation to Bill 115, the Coroners Amendment Act. View Presentation

Submissions to the Ministry of Health and Long-Term Care

January 2009

Nurse Practitioners

Response to HPRAC's consultation on the College of Nurses of Ontario’s proposals to expand the scope of practice for nurse practitioners as part of the Ministry’s mandate to improve interprofessional collaboration. View here

Interprofessional Collaboration

Response to HPRAC's consultation on issues related to interprofessional collaboration among health colleges and professionals. View here

Use of the Title “Doctor”

Comments and advice in response to HPRAC’s consultation on the use of the title “Doctor” in traditional Chinese medicine and more generally. View here

Bill 97 - Presentation to Social Policy Committee

On October 27, 2008, College President Dr. Preston Zuliani made a presentation to the Social Policy Committee in relation to Bill 97, the Increasing Access to Qualified Health Professionals for Ontarians Act. View Presentation.

Interprofessional Care in Ontario: The Regulatory Role

Submission to the Health Professions Regulatory Advisory Council (HPRAC) May 2008

Continued dependence on traditional models of health care delivery is unfeasible. It is imperative that interprofessional care takes its place.

The College urges HPRAC to recommend that government look at remuneration models, their implications for health care spending management by LHINs and at the myriad other, funding-based, inhibitors to a restructuring of health care delivery. We also urge HPRAC to look beyond regulation of individual health professionals and consider how best to ensure that “systems” are subject to the same regulatory rigor.

Bill 171, The Health System Improvements Act, 2006

See Submission to the Standing Committee on Social Policy