Patient Compass: Archives

Assessor News sm

 

Patient Compass (formerly Noteworthy) is our quarterly newsletter for members of the general public. Each issue includes updates from the CPSO that are relevant to patients, their families and other external stakeholders. We use this newsletter to let you know about open CPSO policy consultations and how you can share your opinions on them, inform you of changes to Ontario’s healthcare landscape, and profile interesting people whose work directly impacts patient care. So peruse the archive below and sign up to have each new issue delivered directly to your inbox. Stay informed!

2016

July 2016

26/07/2016

April 2016

21/04/2016

February 2016

09/02/2016

2015

2014

October 2014

10/10/2014

August 2014

07/08/2014

April 2014

22/04/2014

January 2014

16/01/2014