THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 17/12/2017 4:40:08 PM

Akbari, Elaheh (CPSO#: 103526)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 13 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 31 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2014
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Aug 2015