THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 16/12/2017 9:38:53 PM

Trusler, Murray Blakes (CPSO#: 21031)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 07 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Murray Trusler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 25 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1972 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Jun 1966 to 17 Jun 1967
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jan 2011