THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 17/12/2017 4:41:52 PM

Redhill, Marshall Leo (CPSO#: 21076)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Redhill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 2008