THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 23/05/2018 9:06:20 AM

Fulton, Gerald Allan (CPSO#: 22574)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Feb 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Feb 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
17 Richard Street
St Catharines ON  L2T 2E1
Phone: (905) 684-5681
Fax: (905) 684-2556
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 20 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERALD ALLAN FULTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FULTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1970