THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 18/06/2018 9:38:56 AM

Bogo, Norman Harvey (CPSO#: 24304)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 30 Mellowood Dr Toronto, ON M2L 2E3
Date Received: 25 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017