THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 16/12/2017 9:39:20 PM

Townsend, Richard Pardo (CPSO#: 24580)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1971 to 11 Jun 1972
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2012