THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 16/12/2017 9:37:58 PM

Franklin, Reginald Bernard (CPSO#: 26076)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Durham, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Lasalle Walk-In Clinic 18113 Lasalle Blvd Sudbury ON P3A 2A3
Instructions: Call 705.222.9038
Date Received: 26 Aug 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 16 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 2013

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 30 Aug 2007
Summary:

 On August 30, 3007, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Franklin to have committed an act of 
 professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice 
 of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
 as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  The Committee directed Dr. Franklin appear 
 before the panel to be reprimanded and the results of the proceeding be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 30, 2007


Committee: Fitness To Practise
Decision Date: 10 Apr 2003
Summary:

 On April 10, 2003, the Fitness to Practise Committee found Dr. Franklin to be incapacitated and 
 directed that his certificate of registration be subject to terms, conditions and limitations that 
 required workplace monitoring and personal health monitoring.
 

On August 30, 2007 the Fitness to 
 Practise Committee heard a motion to vary the order of April 10, 2003.  The Fitness to Practise 
 Committee found Dr. Franklin to be incapacitated, varied the prior order and ordered that he abide 
 by the terms of an undertaking attached to the Order [of August 30, 2007], which includes a 
 provision that Dr. Franklin practise only with other physicians, each of whom shall be acceptable 
 to the College, and at least one of whom will act as a workplace monitor.  Such workplace monitor 
 will be on the premises whenever Dr. Franklin is practising.  If he does not have a current 
 workplace monitor that is acceptable to the College OR if that workplace monitor is not on the 
 premises, Dr. Franklin will not practice.


On June 9, 2009, the Fitness to Practise Committee 
 heard a motion to vary the order of August 30, 2007. The Fitness to Practise Committee varied the 
 prior order and ordered that he abide by the terms of a revised undertaking attached to the order 
 [of June 9, 2009], which included the same provisions for workplace monitoring as set out in the 
 order dated August 30, 2007.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 10 Apr 2003