THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 16/12/2017 9:38:44 PM

Lee, Cinda Be Shing (CPSO#: 29231)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ellesmere Medical Healthcare Centre
Suite 301
520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone: (416) 491-3331
Fax: (416) 615-2200
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 14 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CINDA BE SHING LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1984