THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 17/12/2017 4:39:58 PM

Taerk, Gary Stephen (CPSO#: 29238)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
300 St Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4V 1S4
Phone: (416) 969-9795
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gary Taerk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Taerk ( CPSO# 29238 )

Business Address:
Suite 102
300 St. Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4V 1S4
Phone Number: (416) 969-9795

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY STEPHEN TAERK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAERK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1977