THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 23/05/2018 9:09:23 AM

Stone, Elaine (CPSO#: 29911)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 May 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 May 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2238 Dundas Street West
Suite 202
Toronto ON  M6R 3A9
Phone: (416) 588-5219
Fax: (416) 588-5221
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto, Ontario, M6R 1B5
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELAINE STONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STONE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 1978