THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 23/05/2018 9:09:55 AM

Lewis, Anthony Joseph (CPSO#: 30902)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1949

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993