THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 17/12/2017 4:41:15 PM

Houston, Patricia Lynn (CPSO#: 31522)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (461) 864-5071
Fax: (416) 864-5929
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patricia Houston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Houston ( CPSO# 31522 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-3062

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA LYNN HOUSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOUSTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1980