THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 16/12/2017 9:37:18 PM

Chung, Stephen Andrew (CPSO#: 33291)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1600
1850 N Central Ave
Phoenix AZ  85004
United States
Phone: (602) 262-8900
Fax: (602) 262-4132

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
USA - Arizona

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 26 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN ANDREW CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982