THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 16/12/2017 9:38:02 PM

Curtis, Margaret Anne (CPSO#: 50313)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
29 Park Road
Toronto ON  M4W 2N2
Phone: (416) 922-9620
Fax: (416) 922-4358
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Anne Curtis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Woodside ( CPSO# 52036 )
Dr. M. Curtis ( CPSO# 50313 )

Business Address:
29 Park Road
Toronto ON  M4W 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 922-9620

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET ANNE CURTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURTIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1982 to 14 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 4 - Dermatology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985