THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 17/12/2017 4:41:37 PM

Wong, Kevin Hoi (CPSO#: 52049)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2901 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 305
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T3
Phone: (416) 264-4600
Fax: (416) 264-0656
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin H. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wong ( CPSO# 52049 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
2901 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T3
Phone Number: (416) 264-4600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN HOI WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1984