THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 22/05/2018 10:14:45 AM

Rother, Mark Jay (CPSO#: 58420)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Peel Regional Cancer Centre
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200 Ext. 5135
Fax: (905) 813-4024
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Rother Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rother ( CPSO# 58420 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Peel Regional Cancer Centre
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 02 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK JAY ROTHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1988