THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 16/01/2018 7:58:35 PM

Lee, Martin M S (CPSO#: 61978)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 02 Nov 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Nov 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martin M. S. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 61978 )

Business Address:
Suite BXO0
777 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5C 4P6
Phone Number: (905) 361-0386

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 20 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2015
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 02 Nov 2017

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Jan 2017
Summary:

On January 17, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Martin M.S. Lee committed an 
act of professional misconduct in that: he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient and he 
engaged in conduct relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
circumstances, would reasonably regarded by members as disgraceful dishonorable and 
unprofessional. 
 
Dr. Lee is a rheumatologist now practising in Mississauga. During the relevant time period, Dr. 
Lee practised in both Pickering and Mississauga. Dr. Lee saw these patients for the treatment of 
pain and fibromyalgia between January 2008 and June 2012.  
 
Regarding Patient A, Dr. Lee engaged in sexual abuse by asking her inappropriate and personal 
questions about her sex life and by showing and discussing a pornographic magazine with her. 
These were remarks and gestures of a sexual nature. He engaged in conduct relevant to the 
practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded 
by members as disgraceful dishonorable and unprofessional by (i) making remarks and gestures 
of a sexual nature as described above; (ii) asking her to pay cash for prescriptions; (iii) asking 
her to fill a prescription for Flamazine for him; and (iv) asking her to video or photograph other 
patients.  
 
Regarding Patient C, Dr. Lee engaged in sexual abuse in that on one occasion, he inappropriately 
rubbed his groin against her right hip area while administering a trigger point injection. This was 
contact of a sexual nature. Dr. Lee also sexually abused Patient C by using sexually explicit and 
crude language when asking her personal questions about her sex life. These were remarks of a 
sexual nature.  
 
Further, Dr. Lee’s line of questioning with respect to Patient C’s personal sex life, and his choice 
of words when asking these questions would reasonably be regarded by members of the 
profession as disgraceful, dishonorable or unprofessional. 
 
Disposition  
 
On November 2, 2017 the Discipline Committee ordered and directed on the matter of penalty 
and costs that: 
 
-  The Registrar revoke Dr. Lee’s certificate of registration effective immediately. 
-  Dr. Lee reimburse the College for funding provided to Patients A and C under the program 
   required under section 85.7 of the Code, and shall post an irrevocable letter of credit or other 
   security acceptable to the College to guarantee payment of such amounts within thirty (30) 
   days of the date this Order becomes final, in the amount of $32,120.00. 
-  Dr. Lee appear before the Committee to be reprimanded within thirty (30) days of the date 
   this Order becomes final. 
-  Dr. Lee pay to the College costs in the amount of $20,500.00 within thirty (30) days of the 
   date of this Order becomes final. 
 
On December 1, 2017, Dr. Lee appealed the decisions on finding and penalty of the Discipline 
Committee to the Superior Court of Justice of Ontario (Divisional Court). In the circumstances, 
the decision of the Discipline Committee remains in effect, despite the appeal.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Hearing Dates:July 18, 19, 21, 22, 2016 Penalty Hearing Date: May 2, 2017