THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 19/06/2018 10:18:30 PM

Teel, Warren David (CPSO#: 62153)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Occupational Health Clinic
171 Kendall Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 4G6
Phone: (519) 337-4627
Fax: (519) 337-9442
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Warren Teel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Teel ( CPSO# 62153 )

Business Address:
Occupational Health Clinic
171 Kendall Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 4G6
Phone Number: (519) 337-4627

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WARREN DAVID TEEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1991