THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 20/05/2018 7:43:14 AM

Dorreen, Mark Sinclair (CPSO#: 65910)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 18 Mar 1996 to 01 Nov 1996
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Nov 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1996
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Nov 1997
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 24 Nov 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2017