THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 22/02/2018 9:54:25 PM

Olech, Victoria Marie (CPSO#: 66498)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
531 Davis Drive
Suite #205
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone: (905) 853-8966
Fax: (905) 853-2953
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victoria Olech Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Olech ( CPSO# 66498 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone Number: (905) 853-8966

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTORIA MARIE OLECH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLECH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1995