THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 20/05/2018 7:50:18 AM

Ghali, Robert John (CPSO#: 70287)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Dec 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert J. Ghali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ghali ( CPSO# 70287 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
749 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1E4
Phone Number: (519) 744-5221

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Jul 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1998
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2014
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 08 Dec 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 08 Dec 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from December 8, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Robert John Ghali, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Ghali to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Ghali has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
            jurisdictions.