THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 23/02/2018 11:26:37 PM

Frank, Cathy Sheila (CPSO#: 71131)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Jan 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
107 - 555 Southdale Rd E
London ON  N6E 1A2
Phone: (519) 685-5559
Fax: (519) 685-5519
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2009
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 27 Apr 2016

Pending Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Frank’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Frank is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in her care of 24 patients. It is also alleged that Dr. Frank failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in her care of 6 patients and was unprofessional, incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in her care of 1 patient.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Motion for Adjournment: August 15, 2017 Hearing Dates: February 26 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 27 Apr 2016 Active View Details [+]


            As  from  April  27,  2016,  the  following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration  held  by Dr. Cathy Sheila Frank,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Frank to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                        DR. CATHY SHEILA FRANK
                                             ("Dr. Frank")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan. 
                  
                  "public register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.  
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Frank, certificate of registration number 71131, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Frank, acknowledge that the College has referred to the Discipline
                  Committee, allegations that I engaged in an act or acts of professional
                  misconduct in that I failed to maintain the standard of practice and am
                  incompetent in my surgical and obstetrical practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Frank, have read the Notice of Hearing dated November 25, 2015,
                  which sets out the allegations against me.  I am aware of the College's
                  concern about protecting the public and I understand the nature of the
                  allegations against me.

            (5)   I, Dr. Frank, acknowledge that the College has accepted this Undertaking
                  in lieu of making an Order under section 37 of the Code.

            (6)   I, Dr. Frank, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force until
                  the matters currently referred are disposed of by a panel of the
                  Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (7)   I, Dr. Frank, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it.

            (8)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Frank, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Frank, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts from all
                              areas of my practice once every month, which shall be
                              selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) independent of my
                              participation, on the basis of the areas of concern
                              identified in the medical inspectors' reports set out at
                              Appendix "B" and any concerns that arise during the period of
                              Clinical Supervision;
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me once every month;
                  
                        (iii) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (iv)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (v)   Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              quarter, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Frank, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the areas of
                        concern identified in the reports of the medical inspectors set out
                        at Appendix "B", and concerns that may arise during the period of
                        Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Frank, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Frank, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Frank, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Frank, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (8)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Frank, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (8)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Frank, undertake to inform the College of each and every location
                  that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to,
                  hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively
                  my "Practice Location(s)"), within fifteen (15) days of executing this
                  Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of
                  any and all new Practice Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing
                  practice at that location.

            (10)  I, Dr. Frank, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                  interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and to
                  any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Frank, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Frank, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Frank, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Frank, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (15)  In the event of an appeal of any order of the Discipline Committee, I,
                  Dr. Frank, agree that if the Discipline Committee has directed the
                  Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.


            (16)  I, Dr. Frank, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the public register during the time period that
                  the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (17)  I, Dr. Frank, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  public register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in
                  effect:

                        Dr. Frank is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee
                        into allegations that she failed to maintain the standard of
                        practice and/or is incompetent in her surgical and obstetrical
                        practice.  As a result of the referral:
                  
                              Dr. Frank must practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (18)  I, Dr. Frank, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP, the Drug Program Services Branch and/or
                  any person or institution who may have relevant information, in order for
                  the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (19)  I, Dr. Frank, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as  Appendix "C". 

            (20)  I, Dr. Frank, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Clinical Supervisors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (21)  I, Dr. Frank, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (22)  I, Dr. Frank, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors and
                  Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A"; and/or
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  
            As from October 21, 2014, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Cathy Sheila Frank,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Frank to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Frank may not engage in (i) the conduct of ultrasound testing; (2)
                  the interpretation of ultrasound images; or (3) the performance of
                  ultrasound-guided procedures, except to the extent necessary to complete
                  a College-approved Remediation Program.
                  
                  
            As from September 14, 2011, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Cathy Sheila Frank,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Frank to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

            Effective immediately, Dr Frank's practice is restricted in the following ways:

                  (i)   She shall not practice in the area of gynecological or obstetrical
                        surgery unless she is doing so as part of a Remediation Program
                        pre-approved by the College and is supervised by a preceptor who is
                        acting as MRP for all patients;
                  (ii)  She shall not apply for gynecological or obstetrical surgery
                        privileges at any hospital whatsoever; and
                  (iii) for further clarity, she shall not engage in the practice of
                        medicine as the Most Responsible Physician ("MRP") in respect of
                        any obstetrical or gynecological patients, at any hospital
                        whatsoever.
                  
            Dr. Frank may apply for courtesy privileges at a hospital, if required, as part
            of her fertility clinic practise, on the condition that she remain in strict
            compliance with the restrictions set out at paragraph 7(a)(i) - 7(a)(iii) above
            during the exercise of said privileges.

            The term "gynecological or obstetrical surgery" in this particular instance
            does not include the following procedures if completed as part of Dr. Frank's
            IVF practice:

                  (i)   intrauterine inseminations, 
                  (ii)  oocyte retrievals; and/or 
                  (iii) embryo transfers
                  
                  
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 27, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Cathy Sheila Frank to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 27, 2016:

Dr. Frank is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations that she failed to maintain the standard of practice and/or is incompetent in her surgical and obstetrical practice. As a result of the referral:

Dr. Frank must practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.