THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 16/12/2017 9:37:05 PM

Perera, Jerome Mevan Waidyaratne (CPSO#: 91458)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Branson Site
555 Finch Avenue West
1-South, Room 114
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Phone: (416) 633-9420 Ext. 6006
Fax: (416) 635-2521
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Partial Hospitalization Program
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
7-South, Day Hospital
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6723
Fax: (416) 756-6427
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEROME MEVAN WAIDYARATNE PERERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERERA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014